This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 13:24:20 (UTC).

Kristine A Worland, Lindsey A Alverson Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Kristine A Worland, Lindsey A Alverson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McLaughlin, Jane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1111

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McLaughlin, Jane

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lindsey A Alverson

Decedent

Kristine A Worland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Gregory Macnabb

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCAE - Claims Against Estate (docket date:12/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNIP - Notice Of Informal Probate (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF INFORMAL PROBATE OF WILL AND APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketPNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing (docket date:10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: LINDSEY A ALVERSON / PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDCC - Declaration/Certificate of Completion (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: LINDSEY A ALVERSON / WITHOUT RESTRICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSIP - Statement Of Informal Probate (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketOPA - Order To Personal Representative & Acknowledgement (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketWIL - Will (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less