Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/29/2016 at 05:54:17 (UTC).

Kolonia L L C VS Alejandro Saucedo Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2014 Kolonia L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Alejandro Saucedo. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Warner, Randall. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2086

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Warner, Randall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kolonia L L C

Defendants

Alejandro Saucedo

Interwest Capital L L C

Donald E Minkoff

Erna Minkoff

Michael A Jacobs

Linda Jacobs

Harp L L C

Norma Martinez Gomez

City Of Tempe

Rigoberto Andrade

H S B C Bank U S A N A

Island Enterprises L L C

Esther E Weber

City Of Phoenix

State Of Arizona

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Becker

Defendant Attorney

Judith Baumann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2015
  • 047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal (docket date:6/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • DFJ - Default Judgment (docket date:6/1/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • NDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:5/14/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • NOTE: Ex Parte Notice of Dismissal AS TO PARCEL 144-85-013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:5/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:5/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • NOTE: Application For Entry of Default as to Defendants Esther Webber and Island Enterprises LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:5/8/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • NOTE: Affidavit of Mailing as to Defendant Esther E. Weber

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:7/11/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration (docket date:6/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • NOTE: Defendant City of Tempe's Certificate regarding Compulsory Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:6/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • NOTE: Answer-CO CHRG RECEIPT #23845183

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/23/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • NOTE: CITY OF TEMPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:5/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • CSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/15/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less