This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 18:54:32 (UTC).

Kenneth M Owens VS Lori A Adrain

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 Kenneth M Owens filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Lori A Adrain. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Bachus, Alison. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2276

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Bachus, Alison

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kenneth M Owens

Respondent

Lori A Adrain

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/09/2020

JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020

DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2020

DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:12/11/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2020

DocketAFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail (docket date:11/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2020

DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:11/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketNLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service (docket date:11/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020

DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/4/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/16/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less