This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:41 (UTC).

Kenneth D Bell Et Al VS Aaron Andrews Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Kenneth D Bell filed an Other lawsuit against Aaron Andrews. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are White, Susan and Garbarino, David. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1714

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

White, Susan

Garbarino, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nationwide Judgment Recovery Inc

Kenneth D Bell

Defendants

Trudy Gilmond

David Kettner

Brandon Huckeba

Zeekrewards.Com

David Sorrells

Durant Brockett

Mary Kettner

Darren Miller

Karen Silver

Michael Van Leeuwen

Shara Andrews

Trudy Gilmond L L C

P A W S Capital Management L L C

T Lemont Silver

Lori Jean Weber

Todd Disner

Innovation Marketing L L C

Rhonda Gates

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary Hess

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCRT - Certification Of Mailing (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Nationwide Judgment Recovery Inc Judgment For: Kenneth D Bell Judgment Against: Brandon Huckeba, Amount: $16,720.99, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Nationwide Judgment Recovery Inc Judgment For: Kenneth D Bell Judgment Against: Brandon Huckeba, Amount: $5,734.48, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AS TO BRANDON HUCKEBA AND JANE/JOHN DOE HUCKEBA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNFJ - Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less