This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 09/04/2020 at 09:51:58 (UTC).

Kenja Lenke VS Brandon Temple

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Kenja Lenke filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Brandon Temple. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Minder, Scott and Nicholls, Suzanne. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0242

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Minder, Scott

Nicholls, Suzanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kenja Lenke

Respondent

Brandon Temple

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution (docket date:8/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:5/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:4/29/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:4/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING TO PARTY B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:4/20/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:4/20/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCME - Credit Memo (docket date:4/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SOLE FOR RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:1/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:1/9/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less