This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 05:42:17 (UTC).

Kendell Critchett VS Alex Salinas

Case Summary

On 03/24/2008 Kendell Critchett filed an Other lawsuit against Alex Salinas. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0836

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kendell Critchett

Defendant

Alex Salinas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Mackinlay

Defendant Attorney

Ronald Huser

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/06/2009

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:1/8/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2009

NOTE: CLAIM / WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2008

SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:12/15/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2008

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2008

ARA - Arbitration Award (docket date:11/18/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2008

SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:11/3/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2008

NDN - Notice Of Decision of Arbitrator (docket date:10/31/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2008

SFC - Stipulation For Continuance (docket date:10/16/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2008

NOTE: ARBITRATION HEARING AND EXTEND TIME FOR HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2008

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:10/16/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
06/07/2008

324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:6/6/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2008

ANS - Answer (docket date:5/14/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2008

NOTE: PAID

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2008

CAG - Certificate Of Agreement (docket date:5/12/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2008

NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2008

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/28/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2008

NOTE: ALEX SALINAS SERVED 03/25/08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2008

SUM - Summons (docket date:3/28/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2008

COM - Complaint (docket date:3/25/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2008

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:3/25/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less