This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/20/2016 at 10:27:50 (UTC).

Kelly Settle-Martin Et Al VS Ralph William van Zwo

Case Summary

On 05/23/2003 Kelly Settle-Martin filed an Other lawsuit against Ralph William van Zwo. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0187

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly Settle-Martin

Tammy Wilson

Mark Wilson

Naomi R Thomas

Defendant

Ralph William van Zwo

In Re

Natalie Wilson

Penelope Wilson

Stormy Settle

Dylan Settle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Alex

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/23/2004

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:4/7/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2004

NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2004

STD - Stipulation To/For Dismissal (docket date:4/14/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2004

NOTE: ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2004

084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar (docket date:2/25/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2004

NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:4/1/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2003

NOH - Notice Of Hearing (docket date:1/5/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2003

NOTE: AMENDED/OF ARBITRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2003

ORD - Order (docket date:4/9/2004)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/26/2003

NOTE: VACATING ARBITRATION AND EXTENDING THE TIME TO HOLD ARBITRATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
08/22/2003

324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (docket date:8/22/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2003

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/5/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2003

NOTE: SERVED RALPH WILLIAM VAN ZWOL IV 07/01/2003

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2003

SUM - Summons (docket date:10/17/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2003

CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration (docket date:7/9/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2003

NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:7/9/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2003

ANS - Answer (docket date:7/10/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2003

NOTE: PAID

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2003

COM - Complaint (docket date:5/27/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2003

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/27/2003)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less