This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:01:59 (UTC).

Kelly El-Min Et Al VS Abbas Alkaissy Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Kelly El-Min filed an Other lawsuit against Abbas Alkaissy. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1731

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelly El-Min

Lorraine M Mayo

Defendants

Abbas Alkaissy

Sword L L C

Omar Alqaysi

Farmerzz Auto L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrea Tazioli

Defendant Attorney

Craig Broadbent

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer to Counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer and Counterclaim-EFILE BILLING $245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FARMERZZ AUTO L L C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OMAR ALQAYSI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ABBAS ALKAISSY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less