This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 23:03:05 (UTC).

Katie N Reeder VS Cheryl Davis Lavoy Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Katie N Reeder filed an Other lawsuit against Cheryl Davis Lavoy. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Campagnolo, Theodore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5169

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Campagnolo, Theodore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katie N Reeder

Defendants

Cheryl Davis Lavoy

Mark Richard Lavoy

Tawny Lavoy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Shapiro

Defendant Attorney

JAY JACOBSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Answer / EFILE BILLING $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Acceptance and Waiver of Service TO DEFENDANT TAWNY LAVOY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice to Withdraw Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMTA - Motion To Amend (docket date:10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MARK RICHARD LAVOY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: CHERYL DAVIS LAVOY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less