This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 11:40:34 (UTC).

Kathryn A Eschen VS Todd T Eschen

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Kathryn A Eschen filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Todd T Eschen. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rea, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3668

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rea, John

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Kathryn A Eschen

Kathryn Ann Spelman

Respondent

Todd T Eschen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRNM - Returned Mail (docket date:2/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketIWO Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access (docket date:1/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:1/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution (docket date:12/31/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNOTE: DEFAULT INFORMATION FOR SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSTA - Statement (docket date:12/13/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/12/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/30/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:10/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:10/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:10/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:10/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less