Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 05:32:52 (UTC).

Kathleen Bice Et Al VS Randy West Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2008 Kathleen Bice filed an Other lawsuit against Randy West. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Oberbillig, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0577

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Oberbillig, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathleen Bice

Terry Bice

Defendants

Randy West

Frank Batchelor

Richard Hanten

Clifford R Piquet

Deborah Roberts

Professional Building Consultants Inc

Northern Peak Properties L L C

Z Blog Worldwide Realty L L C

Nancy Branham

Realty Experts Inc

Barbara Hanten

Herbert Roberts

Nancy Batchelor

Appraisal Services Of Prescott Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Mackinlay

Defendant Attorneys

William Loftus

Robert Bass

Sean Healy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2010
  • 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:3/10/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated (docket date:2/11/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set (docket date:2/8/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2010
  • 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:1/5/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:1/6/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:12/7/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • NOTE: Defendant ReMax Peak Properties Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:12/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • NOTE: Answer of Defendant Re/Max Peak Properties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:12/4/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2008
  • NOTE: HERBERT F ROBERTS AND DEBORAH H ROBERTS SERVED 6/17/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:6/24/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • NOTE: EXTENDED UNTIL 08/24/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/20/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • NOTE: RICHARD HANTEN SERVED 06/18/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:6/12/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2008
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:6/4/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2008
  • AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:4/28/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:2/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less