This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 17:02:10 (UTC).

Karla Denisse Avitia Zarate, Party is a minor: name not published Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Karla Denisse Avitia Zarate, Party is a minor name not published was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Garbarino, David and White, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1725

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Garbarino, David

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karla Denisse Avitia Zarate

In Re

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: Name Change Hearing; Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of order mailed/provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketOCN - Order Change of Name (docket date:12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/28/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less