This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 01:04:57 (UTC).

Karen Jeannette Victor VS Stanley Christopher Victor

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Karen Jeannette Victor filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Stanley Christopher Victor. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LaBianca, Margaret. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4131

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LaBianca, Margaret

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Karen Jeannette Victor

Respondent

Stanley Christopher Victor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Peter Davis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Regular; Result: Decree Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDFS - Default Decree (docket date:12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTE: APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less