This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 11:46:26 (UTC).

Kalandra Dawn Begaye Et Al VS David James Begaye

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Kalandra Dawn Begaye filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against David James Begaye. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Blanchard, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6879

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Blanchard, John

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Witness(1) Dept Of Economic Security (DES)

Kalandra Dawn Begaye

Respondent

David James Begaye

Minor

Party is a minor: name not publishedWitness

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark Ciafullo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: IV-D Establishment of Support

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket003 - ME: Hearing Reset (docket date:11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingEvent: IV-D Establishment of Support; Result: Vacated & Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Order To Appear Title IV-D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketORA - Order To Appear (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less