This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/21/2021 at 23:11:56 (UTC).

June Francis VS Donovan Avenetti

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 June Francis filed an Other lawsuit against Donovan Avenetti. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5201

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

June Francis

Defendant

Donovan Avenetti

Intervenor

American Family Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Klink

Defendant and Intervenor Attorney

Maria Kupillas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketNOTE: REPORT OF EARLY MEETING AND GOOD FAITH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:2/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: American Family's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:2/9/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Service / Donovan Avenetti

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:2/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNOTE: American Family Insurance's Motion to Intervene/EFILE BILLING $333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketMTI Motion to Intervene (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: AND AUTHORIZING SERVICE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketOXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT AND REQUEST FOR SERVICE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less