This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 06:29:03 (UTC).

Julio Jose Munoz Lara VS Yamilex Codinez Flores

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 Julio Jose Munoz Lara filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Yamilex Codinez Flores. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Pineda, Susanna. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0935

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Pineda, Susanna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Julio Jose Munoz Lara

Respondent

Yamilex Godinez Flores

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Ryan Reppucci

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:2/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Limited Scope Representation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNLR Notice Of Limited Scope Representation (docket date:2/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney (docket date:2/3/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEXW - Exhibits Work Sheet (docket date:1/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Yamilex Godinez Flores Judgment Against: Julio Jose Munoz Lara, Amount: $7,513.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Child Support Arrearage

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNOTE: ORDER FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING, PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketJOR - Judgment And Order (docket date:1/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:3/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:3/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:3/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:2/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:2/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:2/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:2/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:2/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:2/28/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less