This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/02/2016 at 01:50:03 (UTC).

Judy Nowlin Et Al VS Stephen Tice Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2007 Judy Nowlin filed an Other lawsuit against Stephen Tice. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Rees, Brian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2774

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Rees, Brian

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judy Nowlin

Pearlmark Construction Inc

Defendants

Stephen Tice

Steves Custom Doors Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janet Linton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2008

002 - ME: Hearing Vacated (docket date:11/21/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2008

003 - ME: Hearing Reset (docket date:10/27/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2008

056 - ME: Hearing Set (docket date:10/2/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2008

NOT - Notice (docket date:10/1/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2008

NOTE: OF CLARIFICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

MOT - Motion (docket date:8/14/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDAGMENT AND NOTICE OF LODGING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

AFF - Affidavit (docket date:8/25/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

NOTE: RE DAMAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees (docket date:8/25/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2008

NOTE: AND VERIFIED STATEMENT OF COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2008

NAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:8/11/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2008

AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default (docket date:4/29/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2008

311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry (docket date:3/12/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2007

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/26/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2007

COM - Complaint (docket date:10/9/2007) (filing party: Plaintiff(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2007

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:10/9/2007) (filing party: Plaintiff(2))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less