This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 01/22/2013 at 05:57:05 (UTC).

Judy Dufour VS Nationstar Mortgage L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/19/2012 Judy Dufour filed an Other lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northwest Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Willett, Eileen. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0958

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Willett, Eileen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judy Dufour

Defendants

Nationstar Mortgage L L C

Home Show Mortgage Inc, The

Quality Loan Service Corporation

Sun Title Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Paul Levine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/26/2012

DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:7/31/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2012

DocketNOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2012

DocketNUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court (docket date:7/20/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2012

DocketNOTE: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/21/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketNOTE: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/21/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketNOTE: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP 07/02/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketMTD - Motion To Dismiss (docket date:7/17/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketNOTE: Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporaton's Motion to Dismiss

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:7/17/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2012

DocketNOTE: $223.00 RECEIVED FROM PAUL LEVINE FOR QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION FOR APPEARANCE FEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2012

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/16/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2012

DocketNOTE: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2012

DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/16/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2012

DocketNOTE: QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2012

DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:6/20/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2012

DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:6/20/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/19/2012

DocketNOTE: LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less