This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:04:02 (UTC).

Judith Ann Burley VS Mariana Lopez Gutierrez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Judith Ann Burley filed an Other lawsuit against Mariana Lopez Gutierrez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5188

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Judith Ann Burley

Defendant

Mariana Lopez Gutierrez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Wolf

Defendant Attorney

Kaitlin Secker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Report of Early Meeting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:2/1/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT / efile billing $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MARIANA LOPEZ GUTIERREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAPU - Affidavit Of Publication (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less