Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 12:45:00 (UTC).

Judah Alvey Et Al VS Brian Bergeron Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2008 Judah Alvey filed an Other lawsuit against Brian Bergeron. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2180

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judah Alvey

Toni-Reed Alvey

Defendants

Brian Bergeron

Ashley Diane Bergeron

Meritage Homes Construction Inc

Meritage Homes Of Arizona Inc

Meritage Management L L C

Meritage Homes Corporation

Rapid Response L L C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Nathanson

Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLAS NORTHUP

Mark Jewett

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2010
  • ORD - Order (docket date:3/4/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • NOTE: ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTIONTO EXTEND THE TIME THIS CASEWILL BE ON THE INACTIVECALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2010
  • MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar (docket date:2/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2010
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND THE TIME THIS CASE WILL BE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:10/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2009
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:9/22/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:9/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2009
  • NOTE: Motion for Summary Ruling on Proposed Form of Judgment and Application for Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • NOTE: MERITAGE MANAGEMENT, LLC SERVED 06/26/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • NOTE: MERITAGE MOMES CORPORATION SERVED 06/26/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • NOTE: MERITAGE HOMES CONSTRUCTION INC SERVED 06/26/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/15/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • NOTE: MERITAGE HOMES OF ARIZONA, INC SERVED 06/26/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:6/23/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:6/23/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less