This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/17/2021 at 18:11:34 (UTC).

Joseph P Ravin, Karen Ravin Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Joseph P Ravin, Karen Ravin was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McLaughlin, Jane. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1109

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McLaughlin, Jane

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Karen Ravin

Decedent

Joseph P Ravin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John Becker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less