This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/19/2020 at 08:38:17 (UTC).

Joseph John Kolacz VS Debra Ann Kolacz

Case Summary

On 08/29/2019 Joseph John Kolacz filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Debra Ann Kolacz. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Coffey, Rodrick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4824

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Coffey, Rodrick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph John Kolacz

Respondent

Debra Ann Kolacz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:11/25/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:11/12/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Docket019 - ME: Ruling (docket date:9/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNOTE: TO EXPEDITE SEPARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketREQ - Request (docket date:9/19/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:10/10/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/6/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/4/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/4/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/4/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/4/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/4/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/4/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less