This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 07:07:59 (UTC).

Josef Jurkiewicz VS Lawrence Wesly Hibner

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Josef Jurkiewicz filed an Other lawsuit against Lawrence Wesly Hibner. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McCoy, M. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1682

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McCoy, M. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Josef Jurkiewicz

Defendant

Lawrence Wesly Hibner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Montana Thompson

Defendant Attorney

Randy Aoyama

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:2/1/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Defendant's Answer/ eFile Billing $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:12/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: LAWRENCE HIBNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less