This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:03:27 (UTC).

Jordan J Jones VS Sunchain Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Jordan J Jones filed an Other lawsuit against Sunchain Corporation. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Agne, Sara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5184

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Agne, Sara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jordan J Jones

Defendant

Sunchain Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Shapiro

Yelena Shimonova

Defendant Attorney

Paul Frame

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Within Firm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney (docket date:2/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketJSR Joint Scheduling Report (docket date:1/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:1/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PAUL K. FRAME AND SPENCER R.W. MCKEE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SUNCHAIN CORPORATION DBA SUNCHAIN TANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNAR - Notice Of Appearance (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: SUNCHAIN CORPORATION DBA SUNCHAING TANNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less