This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/26/2020 at 09:27:19 (UTC).

Jonathan Barrera Cruz VS Maricela Guerrero Velez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Jonathan Barrera Cruz filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Maricela Guerrero Velez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Como, Greg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5683

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Como, Greg

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jonathan Barrera Cruz

Respondent

Maricela Guerrero Velez

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less