Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 05/26/2016 at 18:10:40 (UTC).

Johnny Vasquez Et Al VS Alfredo Guevara Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2008 Johnny Vasquez filed an Other lawsuit against Alfredo Guevara. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is LeMaire, Kerstin. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9010

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

LeMaire, Kerstin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnny Vasquez

Arnoldo Parker

Sylvia Parker

Defendants

Alfredo Guevara

Maricopa Community Health Center

Santa Cruz Urology

J Bernardo Rebeil-De La Rosa

Holy Cross Hospital Inc

Ang K Sherpa

Carondelet Health Newowrk

William Bartholomew

In Re

Vincent Vasquez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elliot Wolfe

Defendant Attorneys

Laura Macban

Mary Isban

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2009
  • ANS - Answer (docket date:5/14/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • NOTE: PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT ANG K SHERPA MD'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:5/21/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • NOTE: DEFENDANT ANG K SHERPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • REC - Receipt (docket date:5/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • NOTE: CERTIFIED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • RDS - Remand Docket Sheet (docket date:4/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • RDS - Remand Docket Sheet (docket date:4/15/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2009
  • CER - Certificate (docket date:2/5/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED OF NEED FOR EXPERT OPINIONS TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/5/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:2/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • NOTE: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:11/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • CER - Certificate (docket date:11/17/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • NOTE: OF NEED FOR EXPERT OPINION TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less