Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2016 at 13:46:44 (UTC).

John Steven Simon VS Officer Masad Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2008 John Steven Simon filed an Other lawsuit against Officer Masad. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Hannah, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2541

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Hannah, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Steven Simon

Defendants

Officer Masad

Phoenix City Police Department Central City Prct 500

Officer Borquez

Officer Smoger

Officer Kerely

Officer Burke

Officer Coudret

Officer Ippel

Officer Edwards

Maricopa Medical Center

Officer Moore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lori Berke

Sherle Flaggman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2012
  • 049 - ME: Judgment Signed (docket date:5/22/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • JUD - Judgment (docket date:5/23/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2012
  • NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/31/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS REPLY AND OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • REL - Reply (docket date:5/14/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • NOTE: Joint Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Joint Notice of Lodging Form of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • MOT - Motion (docket date:5/10/2012) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2012
  • NOTE: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE MOTION TO DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF LODGING FORM OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • NOT - Notice (docket date:4/20/2012)

    Read MoreRead Less
253 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2008
  • NOTE: TO MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • MTD - Motion To Dismiss (docket date:12/11/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/5/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2008
  • SUM - Summons (docket date:12/9/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2008
  • AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:11/20/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:11/19/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:11/19/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs (docket date:11/19/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:11/19/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:11/19/2008) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less