This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 06:04:46 (UTC).

Joan White, William J White Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Joan White, William J White was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kalman, Amy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3882

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kalman, Amy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joan White

Decedent

William J White

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nora Jones

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNOTE: AMENDED / JOAN WHITE / WITHOUT RESTRICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:1/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: EXTENDING APPOINTMENT AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:1/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNOTE: TO EXTEND APPOINTMENT AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOAN WHITE / WITHOUT RESTRICTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketLTA - Letter Of Appointment (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAAR - Accpt Appoint Personal Rep/Guard/Conservator (docket date:10/2/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketSIP - Statement Of Informal Probate (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:9/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPAC - PROBATE REGISTRAR ACCEPTANCE (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIF - Probate Information Sheet/Form - Restricted Access (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less