This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/24/2020 at 08:38:09 (UTC).

Jennifer Lynn Selby VS Christopher Thomas Selby

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Jennifer Lynn Selby filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Christopher Thomas Selby. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Driggs, Adam. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1992

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Driggs, Adam

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jennifer Lynn Selby

Respondent

Christopher Thomas Selby

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCDS - Consent Decree (docket date:2/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketOCS - Order For Child Support (docket date:2/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:2/18/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support (docket date:2/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid (docket date:2/6/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Parent Education Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPEC - Parent Education Certificate (docket date:12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:12/9/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:11/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:11/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:11/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children (docket date:11/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:11/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:11/21/2019) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less