This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 06:02:25 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems L L C VS Trudie Kenny

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Jefferson Capital Systems L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Trudie Kenny. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1893

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems L L C

Defendants

Trudie Kenny

Stewart Kenny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Bullock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Declaration of Service / TRUDIE KENNY and STEWART KENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less