This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:19:20 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems L L C VS Paula Merchant Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Jefferson Capital Systems L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Paula Merchant. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1889

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems L L C

Defendants

Russell Merchant

Paula Merchant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Bullock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Filing-Declaration of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: NOTICE OF FILING - Declaration of Service/PAULA MERCHANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less