This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 22:17:42 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems L L C VS Michael Meyer

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Jefferson Capital Systems L L C filed an Other lawsuit against Michael Meyer. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1917

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems L L C

Defendant

Michael Meyer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Bullock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:2/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Application for and Affidavit on Entry for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:2/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Declaration of Service / MICHAEL MEYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/5/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less