This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:02:29 (UTC).

Jason Sommers Et Al VS David Knopp Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Jason Sommers filed an Other lawsuit against David Knopp. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Kiley, Daniel and Russell, Andrew. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1737

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Kiley, Daniel

Russell, Andrew

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kristina Sommers

Jason Sommers

Defendants

Michelle Marie Knopp

David Knopp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eddie Pantiliat

Defendant Attorney

Beth Bruno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Answer of Defendant David Knopp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANT MICHELLE M. KNOPPS AMENDED ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Agreement RE: COMPULSORY Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate of Agreement re: Compulsory ArbITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNOTE: ANSWER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT MICHELLE M. KNOPP/ eFile Billing $245.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Certificate Of Compulsory Arbitration - Is Not Subject To

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less