This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/17/2020 at 19:06:02 (UTC).

Jared B Hancock VS Margaret Mondino

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Jared B Hancock filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Margaret Mondino. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Coffey, Rodrick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4784

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Coffey, Rodrick

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jared B Hancock

Respondent

Margaret Mondino

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney (docket date:1/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: Resolution Management Conference; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Against:, Frequency: One Time, Type: Judgment Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Decree of Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDDI - Decree Of Dissolution (docket date:12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set (docket date:11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:11/22/2019) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:11/25/2019) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:11/22/2019) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNOTE: Application and Affidavit for Default in Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:8/9/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:8/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:8/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:8/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:8/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:8/1/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less