This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:11:18 (UTC).

Janice Barnes VS Pauline Pinkney

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Janice Barnes filed an Other lawsuit against Pauline Pinkney. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell, Andrew and Agne, Sara. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5180

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Russell, Andrew

Agne, Sara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janice Barnes

Defendant

Pauline Pinkney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darius Bursh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Waiver of Service / PAULINE PINKNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketWSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons (docket date:12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less