This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 10:25:39 (UTC).

James M Sleezer Et Al VS Maricopa County

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 James M Sleezer filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Maricopa County. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Garbarino, David and White, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0641

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Garbarino, David

White, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Judith A Berry

James M Sleezer

Defendant

Maricopa County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Davina Bressler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • Docket022 - ME: Order Signed (docket date:3/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:3/4/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMTD - Motion To Dismiss (docket date:2/3/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/8/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:10/22/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketAPE - Application/Petition (docket date:10/22/2020) (filing party: Plaintiff(1))

    Read MoreRead Less