This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 07/25/2016 at 04:29:58 (UTC).

James Lambson VS Norquay Construction Inc Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2012 James Lambson filed an Other lawsuit against Norquay Construction Inc. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson, Aimee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0615

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson, Aimee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Lambson

Defendants

Norquay Construction Inc

Hartford Casualty Insurance Company

Hartford Casualty Insurance Agencies

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Britt

Defendant Attorney

Kent Lang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/22/2013

ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:2/22/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2013

NOTE: Order OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2013

SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:2/14/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2013

NOTE: Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2013

078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:1/16/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2013

NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:1/10/2013)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2013

NOTE: JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO VACATE RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2012

041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set (docket date:12/5/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2012

REQ - Request (docket date:11/26/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2012

NOTE: Request for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
02/23/2012

AMC - Amended Complaint (docket date:2/24/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2012

NOTE: First Amended Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2012

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/17/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2012

NOTE: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE AGENCIES SERVED 02/06/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2012

SUM - Summons (docket date:2/10/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2012

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/15/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2012

NOTE: NORQUAY CONSTRUCTION INC SERVED 2/1/12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2012

SUM - Summons (docket date:2/9/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2012

COM - Complaint (docket date:2/2/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2012

CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:2/2/2012)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less