This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 11/21/2020 at 04:25:12 (UTC).

James Dewilde VS Taryn Buckles

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 James Dewilde filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Taryn Buckles. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Julian, Melissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3008

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Julian, Melissa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

James Dewilde

Respondent

Taryn Buckles

Minor

Party is a minor: name not published

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: Early Resolution Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketERC - Early Resolution Management Conference (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketANS - Answer (docket date:10/19/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:10/16/2020) (filing party: Respondent(2))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPPL PARENTING PLAN (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf (docket date:9/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/25/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less