This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 08:34:17 (UTC).

James Clement VS Cecily Lynn Lawler Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2008 James Clement filed an Other lawsuit against Cecily Lynn Lawler. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Talamante, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2623

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Talamante, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Clement

Defendants

Cecily Lynn Lawler

Estate Of Sandra Rogers, The

Carol Land

Prescott Air Repair Inc

William Goudreault

Estate Of Gerald Wayne Land, The

Intervenor

A I G Aviation Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H Wright

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Toone

KEVIN NEAL

Intervenor Attorney

Christian Henrichsen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2010
  • 079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial (docket date:5/5/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:4/29/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • NOTE: AS TO INTERVENOR ITS INSUREDS AND POTENTIAL INSUREDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • ODI - Order Of Dismissal (docket date:5/4/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2010
  • SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal (docket date:4/16/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2010
  • NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PRESCOTT AIR REPAIR INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry (docket date:3/1/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • NOS - Notice Of Settlement (docket date:2/23/2010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • NOTE: Notice of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
127 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOTE: PRESCOTT AIR REPAIR INC SERVED 12/19/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOTE: CECILY LYNN LAWLER / SERVED 12/19/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOTE: DAN C LAWLER / SERVED 12/19/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2009
  • OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:1/9/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2008
  • MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/26/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss (docket date:12/10/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • COM - Complaint (docket date:9/3/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/3/2008)

    Read MoreRead Less