This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 17:45:27 (UTC).

Jacqueline Creighan VS J P S Investments L L C Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Jacqueline Creighan filed an Other lawsuit against J P S Investments L L C. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Campagnolo, Theodore. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2869

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Campagnolo, Theodore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacqueline Creighan

Defendants

John Creighan

J P S Investments L L C

James Schleg

Preston Burrell

Others

U S A A Casualty Insurance Company

Donald Yearin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Wade

Defendant Attorneys

F Cannata

William Schrank

Other Attorneys

Timothy Ducar

Donald Yearin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • Docket053 - ME: Case Consolidation (docket date:11/5/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of No Objection to Defendants James Schleg and JPS Investment, LLC's Corrected Motion to ConsOLIDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:11/5/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANTS JAMES SCHLEG'S & JPS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S CORRECTED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMCD - Motion To Consolidate (docket date:10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANTS JAMES SCHLEG'S & JPS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMCD - Motion To Consolidate (docket date:10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: DEFENDANTS JAMES SCHLE'S & JPS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S NOTICE OF ERRATA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNOT - Notice (docket date:10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:9/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:8/7/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS PRESTON AND JANE DOE BURRELL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:8/6/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Waiver of Service of summons and compaint and accceptance of same

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketWSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons (docket date:7/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNOTE: JPS INVESTMENTS LLC AND JAMES SCHLEG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:7/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:5/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:5/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:5/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less