This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 06/10/2016 at 06:14:25 (UTC).

Jaclyn Marie Wesolowski VS Daniel Jonathan Faith

Case Summary

On 05/24/2007 Jaclyn Marie Wesolowski filed an Other lawsuit against Daniel Jonathan Faith. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Southeast Court Complex located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Oberbillig, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1131

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Southeast Court Complex

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Oberbillig, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jaclyn Marie Wesolowski

Defendant

Daniel Jonathan Faith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLAS NELSON

Defendant Attorney

Daniel Torrens

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2010

SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment (docket date:11/29/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2010

NOTE: ARBITRATION AWARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2010

042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full (docket date:5/5/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2010

078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar (docket date:2/19/2010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2009

ORD - Order (docket date:11/17/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2009

NOTE: APPROVING BINDING ARBITRATION AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2009

NOT - Notice (docket date:11/4/2009)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2009

NOTE: PRIVATE BINDING ARBITRATION AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2008

029 - ME: Status Conference (docket date:12/15/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/19/2008

028 - ME: Status Conference Set (docket date:8/19/2008)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
07/02/2007

NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials (docket date:7/5/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2007

NOTE: DEFENDANTS'

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2007

ANS - Answer (docket date:7/6/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2007

NOTE: PAID

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2007

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:6/19/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2007

NOTE: SERVED DANIEL J FAITH AND JANE DOE FAITH ON 06/05/07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2007

SUM - Summons (docket date:6/19/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2007

AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service (docket date:5/30/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2007

COM - Complaint (docket date:5/25/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2007

CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:5/25/2007)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less