This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2017 at 07:20:05 (UTC).

Islands Community Association, The VS Matthew Vaughn

Case Summary

On 09/22/2016 Islands Community Association, The filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Matthew Vaughn. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Garbarino, David. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4424

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Garbarino, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Islands Community Association, The

Defendant

Matthew Vaughn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Waldron

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/26/2017

ORD - Order (docket date:1/31/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2017

NOTE: THAT PLAINTIFF IS AWARDED THE SUM OF 987.50 IN ATTORNEYS FEES AND 371.88 FOR COSTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2017

WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons (docket date:1/6/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2017

AFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:1/6/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment (docket date:1/4/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

AAF - Application For Attorney Fees (docket date:1/4/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

SOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:1/4/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

NOTE: POST-JUDGMENT/ AND NOTICE OF TAXATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

AFF - Affidavit (docket date:1/4/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

NOTE: CHINA DOLL/ OF REBECCA L EASTON IN SUPPORT OF POST JUDGMENT AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

NOT - Notice (docket date:1/4/2017)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2017

NOTE: OF LODGING OF PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

CSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/23/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

TJU - Judgment (docket date:9/23/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

NOTE: CERTIFIED COPY FROM HIGHLAND JC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:9/23/2016)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

NOTE: CERTIFIED COPY FROM HIGHLAND JC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

Judgment For: Islands Community Association, The Judgment Against: Matthew Vaughn, Amount: $4,085.92, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

Judgment For: Islands Community Association, The Judgment Against: Matthew Vaughn, Amount: $850.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2016

Judgment For: Islands Community Association, The Judgment Against: Matthew Vaughn, Amount: $182.88, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less