This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 01:02:32 (UTC).

Iris Elizabeth Rivas VS Noe Torres Torres

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Iris Elizabeth Rivas filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Noe Torres Torres. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Astrowsky, Brad. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4118

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Astrowsky, Brad

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Iris Elizabeth Rivas

Respondent

Noe Torres Torres

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketNIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case (docket date:1/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: Decree on Demand - Spanish; Result: Failure To Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/7/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/30/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketACS - Acceptance Of Service (docket date:10/1/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPIN - Preliminary Injunction (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketADW - Application Deferral/Waiver (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketODF - Order Deferring Court Fees (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020) (filing party: Petitioner(1))

    Read MoreRead Less