This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 23:03:20 (UTC).

International Integrity First L L C, Michael D Terry Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 International Integrity First L L C, Michael D Terry was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Campagnolo, Theodore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5185

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Campagnolo, Theodore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maggi Liechty

Defendants

International Integrity First L L C

Ryan Infinity Inc

Mike Taggart & Associates L L C

Michael D Terry

Sandy Terry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon Curdie

Defendant Attorneys

John Browder

Richard Mack

Robert Spurlock

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:2/2/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNOTE: TIER 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSCO Scheduling Order (docket date:1/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation Regarding Tier Designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSTP - Stipulation (docket date:1/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:1/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Joint Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketREP - Report (docket date:1/7/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSUM - Summons (docket date:10/7/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MIKE TAGGART & ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTE: MICHAEL D TERRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/8/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less