This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/26/2018 at 10:44:39 (UTC).

I N A Group L L C VS William M Russell Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 I N A Group L L C filed an Other lawsuit against William M Russell. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Maricopa County Southeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Udall, David. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0774

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Udall, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

I N A Group L L C

Defendants

William M Russell

Glacier Bank

State Of Arizona

Arizona Department Of Revenue

Blue Duck L L C

Royce T Flora

K S Ventures L L C

Theodore L Freeman And Susan B Freeman Living Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Kessler

Defendant Attorneys

Shyla Freestone

Dustin McBride

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:1/5/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNOTE: Sheriff conduct the sale of the Property pursuant to the Writ of General Execution in accordance with such finding

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketNPD - Notice Case on Dismissal Calendar (docket date:12/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketMOT - Motion (docket date:12/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketNOTE: Expedited Motion for Determination Order Re: Homestead Exemption

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketAPL - Application (docket date:12/4/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketNOTE: FOR WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:10/30/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketAFF - Affidavit (docket date:11/2/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketNOTE: KS VENTURES LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/7/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketNOTE: CHARLES HOSKINS / MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:4/7/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2017
  • DocketNOTE: STATE OF ARIZONA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:3/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:3/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:3/27/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketJudgment For: I N A Group L L C Judgment Against: William M Russell, Amount: $2,500.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketJudgment For: I N A Group L L C Judgment Against: William M Russell, Amount: $1,184.32, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less