This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:11:09 (UTC).

Hughes Federal Credit Union VS Krystine Catheryn Julander Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hughes Federal Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Krystine Catheryn Julander. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5178

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hughes Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Michael Grady Julander

Krystine Catheryn Julander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett Culver

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Hughes Federal Credit Union Judgment Against: Michael Grady Julander Judgment Against: Krystine Catheryn Julander, Amount: $12,399.94, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Hughes Federal Credit Union Judgment Against: Michael Grady Julander Judgment Against: Krystine Catheryn Julander, Amount: $452.51, Frequency: One Time, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Hughes Federal Credit Union Judgment Against: Michael Grady Julander Judgment Against: Krystine Catheryn Julander, Amount: $3,347.98, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: Hughes Federal Credit Union Judgment Against: Michael Grady Julander Judgment Against: Krystine Catheryn Julander, Amount: $333.00, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSTJ - Stipulated Judgment (docket date:11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Stipulation to Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketSFJ - Stipulation For Judgment (docket date:11/3/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less