This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:10:56 (UTC).

Hughes Federal Credit Union VS Gilbert Sauceda

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hughes Federal Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Gilbert Sauceda. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5175

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hughes Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Gilbert Sauceda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett Culver

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNOTE: GILBERT SAUCEDA AND J DOE SAUCEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:2/5/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketOXS - Order To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Motion to Extend Time for Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketMXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service (docket date:12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less