This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 17:00:55 (UTC).

Hughes Federal Credit Union VS Cesar E Valencia

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hughes Federal Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Cesar E Valencia. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Central Court Building located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is McCoy, M. Scott. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1717

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Court Building

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

McCoy, M. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hughes Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Cesar E Valencia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:12/9/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNDI - Notice Of Dismissal (docket date:11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: $24,320.00 / MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY (MUTUAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketBRP - Bond On Replevin (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNOTE: FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketORD - Order (docket date:11/4/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTE: OF MANNY NAVARRO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAFF - Affidavit (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less