This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 22:10:36 (UTC).

Hughes Federal Credit Union VS Antony Ramirez

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hughes Federal Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Antony Ramirez. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5171

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hughes Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Antony Ramirez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett Culver

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Entry Judgment Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:1/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Declaration of Costs and attorneys fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDCL - Declaration (docket date:1/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Declaration of Sum Certain Judgment Amount

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDCL - Declaration (docket date:1/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application and Declaration for Default Notice of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNOTE: ANTONY RAMIREZ AND J DOE RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less