This case was last updated from Maricopa County Superior Courts on 02/27/2021 at 23:03:54 (UTC).

Hughes Federal Credit Union VS Angelique Ann Jaurigue Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Hughes Federal Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Angelique Ann Jaurigue. This case was filed in Maricopa County Superior Courts, Northeast Regional Court Center located in Maricopa, Arizona. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5172

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Northeast Regional Court Center

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hughes Federal Credit Union

Defendants

Angelique Ann Jaurigue

Thomas James Jaurigue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garrett Culver

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Hughes Federal Credit Union Judgment Against: Thomas James Jaurigue Judgment Against: Angelique Ann Jaurigue, Amount: $11,725.61, Frequency: One Time, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Hughes Federal Credit Union Judgment Against: Thomas James Jaurigue Judgment Against: Angelique Ann Jaurigue, Amount: $394.70, Frequency: One Time, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: Hughes Federal Credit Union Judgment Against: Thomas James Jaurigue Judgment Against: Angelique Ann Jaurigue, Amount: $3,165.91, Frequency: One Time, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketJUD - Judgment (docket date:2/2/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Declaration of Costs AND ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketSOC - Statement Of Costs (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Declaration of Sum CERTAIN Judgment AMOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketDCL - Declaration (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketNOTE: Motion for Entry of Judgment Without Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketMAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear (docket date:1/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • Docket023 - ME: Order Entered By Court (docket date:11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNOTE: Application AND DECLARATION for Default NOTICE of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default (docket date:11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOTE: THOMAS JAMES JAURIGUE AND ANGELIQUE ANN JAURIGUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketAFS - Affidavit Of Service (docket date:10/6/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCSH - Coversheet (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCOM - Complaint (docket date:9/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less